U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00117
  • Case Name: National Farmers Union Property & Casualty Company v. Preston et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 09, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
December, 2021
  • December 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2021: [Counterclaim]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 07, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.