U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Burr v. Discover Financial Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 28, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Remark]
  • October 07, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.