U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Champagne v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.