U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Andrews v. DeJoy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Remark]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Appeal Notification Form - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 18, 2021: [USM 285 Return Unexecuted - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 12, 2021: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Jury Notes]
  • November 12, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 12, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 12, 2021: [Witness List - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Jury List]
  • November 08, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Pretrial Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [USM 285 Return Unexecuted - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Appear]
  • October 14, 2021: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • October 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.