U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00104
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $155,379.00 in U.S. Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 22, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 21, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Entry of Default]
  • December 21, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.