U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Bertelsen v Dunhop et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 09, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 13, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 12, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.