U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Montana Democratic Party et al v. Jacobsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 20, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [Stay]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Statement - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 11, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 12, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.