U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Neiss v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 04, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.