U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Kenner v. Bitterroot Timber Frames, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 26, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 09, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Appear]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 13, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.