U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.