U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Jarvis v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Remark]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.