U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 06, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.