U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Giannetta v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Pro Se Response to Motion - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Appear]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 14, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Remark]
  • November 16, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 15, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.