U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Stokes v. Drummond
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 18, 2021: [Stay]
  • October 15, 2021: [Bankruptcy Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.