U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Allied Insurance Company of America et al v. Shen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 17, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 09, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • April 25, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • April 13, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 12, 2022: [Counterclaim]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 04, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • January 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 11, 2022: [Counterclaim]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 15, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 15, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.