U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Jones v. Butte-Silver Bow Primary Health Care Clinic
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Appear]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Substitute Party]
  • October 19, 2021: [Remark]
  • October 19, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.