U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Robertson et al v. Lake County Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Remark]
  • October 19, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.