U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Barry v. Bragg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Lift Stay - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 14, 2022: [Lift Stay - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.