U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Neal et al v. Greenfields Irrigation District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Stay]
  • October 04, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 29, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • September 28, 2022: [Joinder]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • August 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 17, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 20, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 17, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 17, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.