U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Milstid v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.