U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05195-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Duvall
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Vacate]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.