U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Chezem v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Social Security Opening Brief]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Administrative Record]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 19, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.