U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Holscher v. The United States et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 08, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.