U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Fink v. State of Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 03, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • December 03, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.