U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Flores v. Lewis and Clark County Sheriff's Office
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.