U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Lee v. Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Administrative Record]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 21, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 21, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.