U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Quinlan v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 31, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.