U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Coyote
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 21, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.