U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Nickerson v. Montana State Prison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 20, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 15, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.