U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 29, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 26, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.