U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamere
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Terminating Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • December 27, 2021: [Appear]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.