U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaha
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.