U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Champagne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.