U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Tchenguiz v. Bird
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 26, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • January 05, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • January 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 30, 2021: [Hearing]
  • December 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Discovery]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Administrative Record]
  • December 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2021: [Redact - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Clarify - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • November 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • November 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • October 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Expedite]
  • October 22, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 22, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.