U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baenziger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • August 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 30, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 26, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.