U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order for Warrant ]
  • March 08, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Docket Entry AND Document-use ONLY with other selection]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.