U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 01, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.