U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schultz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 24, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.