U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Lelani Hope Rickert vs. Robert G. Drummond
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appellees Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Appellants Brief]
  • November 04, 2021: [Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record]
  • November 03, 2021: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • October 22, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.