U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Chixna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.