U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bishop
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.