U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andersen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.