U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murrow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.