U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chandler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Vacate]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.