U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.