U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.