U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 26, 2022: [Vacate]
  • May 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.