U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • February 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 25, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.