U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wooten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • January 14, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.