U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sage et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 16, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • December 16, 2021: [Letter - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.